+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4823.)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5459.)
- Coauthors revised.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 21).
- Coauthors revised.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 21, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR191 Limón et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
May 21, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor