+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5284.)
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5863.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7).
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 13, 2018: Special Consent ACR187
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 7, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor