+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.)
On August 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 30, 2020: ACR 187 Boerner Horvath Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
March 12, 2020: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor