+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5278.)
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4532.)
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 13, 2018: Consent Calendar ACR184
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 3, 2018: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2018: ACR 184 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 7
April 2, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor