+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4360.)
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5034.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2018: Special Consent ACR180
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor