+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 329.)
- Coauthors revised.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 12).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR18
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
February 12, 2021: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor