+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4263.)
- Coauthors revised.
On March 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12).
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2018: Special Consent ACR178
- Yeas: 39
March 12, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor