+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5066.)
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5644.)
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 17, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd ACR177 Frazier
- Yeas: 39
August 9, 2016: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
August 1, 2016: ACR 177 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 29, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2016: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor