+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4879.)
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5478.)
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 11, 2016: Special Consent ACR176 Cristina Garcia
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 8, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor