+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 185, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4920.)
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 6326.)
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18).
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 27, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR174 Nestande By Fuller
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 18, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor