+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4994.)
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 29, 2014: W/O REF. TO FILE ACR170 Holden
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 21, 2014: ACR 170 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
August 18, 2014: Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor