+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4266.)
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate.
- Coauthors revised.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2022: Special Consent ACR167
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
May 19, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor