+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4876.)
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4818.)
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 11, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd ACR165 Bigelow
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 28, 2016: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2016: ACR 165 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 11, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 18, 2016: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor