+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2020.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4378.)
On August 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.)
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On March 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 28, 2020: Consent Calendar ACR165
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 4, 2020: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2020: ACR 165 Ting Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 4, 2020: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor