+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2020.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On June 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3686.)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4097.)
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 14).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2020: Special Consent ACR164
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2020: ACR 164 Blanca Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
February 14, 2020: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Blanca Rubio
Type:
Primary Sponsor