+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6180.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4562.)
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5808.)
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 19, 2014: ACR 163 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 18, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR163 Ridley-Thomas By Beall
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 30, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (72)
Ridley-Thomas
Type:
Primary Sponsor