+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3964.)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4623.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR161 Waldron By Nguyen
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 21, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor