+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On August 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4730.)
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5477.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 1, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR160 Hadley By Allen
- Yeas: 39
April 18, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor