+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 186.)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 276.)
- Coauthors revised.
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 28).
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
- From printer.
On January 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2019: Special Consent ACR16
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 4
January 28, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor