+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3101.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2467.)
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29).
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2345.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
September 11, 2017: AJR 16 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
September 5, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR16 Low et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 40
June 26, 2017: AJR 16 LOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
June 20, 2017: Be adopted as amended.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor