+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3557.)
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3981.)
- Coauthors revised.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2022: Special Consent ACR158
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 17, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor