+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5158.)
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5643.)
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 19, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR158 Holden By Pan
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 9, 2016: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: ACR 158 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 29, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2016: Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor