+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3344.)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3923.)
- Coauthors revised.
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 25).
On January 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Amended.
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On January 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2018: Special Consent ACR157
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2018: Be adopted as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor