+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4559.)
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Measure version as amended on August 11 corrected.
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5962.)
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 18, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR155 Bocanegra By Mitchell
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 17, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor