+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3130.).
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2690.)
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 876.)
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
September 11, 2015: ACR 15 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR15 Levine By Stone
- Yeas: 40
March 23, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (95)
Type:
Primary Sponsor