+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6049.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4987.)
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2016: ACR 148 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR148 Chau By Roth
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2016: Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 9, 2016: ACR 148 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 19, 2016: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor