+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2020.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On February 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled measure version corrected.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3233.)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3866.)
- Coauthors revised.
On January 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 17).
On January 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2020: Special Consent ACR145
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
January 17, 2020: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor