+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4658.)
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4472.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
August 4, 2022: Special Consent ACR144
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 28, 2022: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2022: ACR 144 Gray Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 6
April 25, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor