+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3758.)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4994.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2014: Special Consent #16 ACR138 Achadjian
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
May 1, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor