+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On February 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3258.)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On January 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3765.)
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 8).
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2018: Special Consent ACR137
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
January 12, 2018: ACR 137 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 12
January 8, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor