+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3161.)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3672.)
- Coauthors revised.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3635.) (February 18).
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2022: Special Consent ACR132
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2022: ACR 132 Luz Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 6
February 18, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor