+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 221.)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On January 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 224.)
- Coauthors revised.
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 23).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # ACR13
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
January 23, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor