+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5441.).
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3758.)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5026.)
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 9, 2014: ACR 128 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
June 5, 2014: Special Consent #16 ACR128 Ting
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
May 19, 2014: ACR 128 TING Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2014: Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor