+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4151.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4708.)
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2016: Special Consent # ACR125 Chau
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor