+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2716.)
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2909.)
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 22).
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
September 9, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR121
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: ACR 121 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 12
August 22, 2019: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor