+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6639.).
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4902.)
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5849.)
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 28, 2014: ACR 118 LOGUE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd ACR118 Logue
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 12, 2014: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11
August 4, 2014: ACR 118 LOGUE Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 23, 2014: Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
June 12, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Transportation.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor