+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 6214.).
- Coauthors revised.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6).
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
August 6, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor