+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3757.)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4830.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2014: Special Consent #16 ACR110 Fox
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
April 2, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor