+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 508.).
On February 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 268.)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 237.)
- Coauthors revised.
On January 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 26).
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced measure version corrected.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2017: ACR 11 BAKER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
February 27, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR11 Baker et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor