+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3243.)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4237.)
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24).
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On March 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2014: Special Consent #12 ACR109 Brown By Torres
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 24, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor