+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2014.
On May 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3361.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4333.)
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1).
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 5, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR106 Gordon
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 3, 2014: ACR 106 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 1, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor