+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.)
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2458.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 22, 2019: Special Consent ACR104
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2019: ACR 104 Bonta Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 8
June 20, 2019: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor