+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2715.)
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2948.)
- Coauthors revised
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 24).
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR104 Gloria et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 40
August 24, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor