+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.)
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2311.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
July 11, 2019: Special Consent ACR103
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor