+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2896.)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2518.)
- Coauthors revised.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 19).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2022: Special Consent ACR100
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2021: ACR 100 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
August 19, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor