+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1993.)
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2012.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On February 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
July 15, 2021: Special Consent ACR1
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2021: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor