+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On July 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Kalra.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 13).
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 13, 2021: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor