+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2020.
On June 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3816.)
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 23).
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3799.)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 3050.)
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 10).
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading ACA6 McCarty et al. By Bradford
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
June 18, 2020: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
September 5, 2019: ACA 6 McCarty Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 6
July 10, 2019: Be adopted.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
June 19, 2019: Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor