+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Joint Rules suspended.
- (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 968.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 969.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
- Read first time.
- Joint Rules suspended.
- (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 653.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 654.)
- Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2017: ACA 5 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 24
April 6, 2017: ACA 5 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading Amend By HARPER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading (Supplemental File 1) ACA5 Frazier et al. By Newman
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2