+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2020.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
On June 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 3814.)
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3799.)
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 4799.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
On January 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 24, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading ACA5 Weber et al. By Mitchell
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
June 17, 2020: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 10, 2020: ACA 5 Weber Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
June 3, 2020: Be adopted.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2020: Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2020: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employment and Retirement]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor